U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cv-00175
  • Case Name: Arizona Student DOE #2 v. Trump et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Order]
  • May 02, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Transfer Related Case]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Set Motion Hearing ]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 01, 2025: [Supplement]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Transcript Request]
  • April 29, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 29, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Transfer Related Case]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ]
  • April 29, 2025: [Transcript Request]
  • April 28, 2025: [Response to Motion to Consolidate/Transfer Cases]
  • April 25, 2025: [Transfer Related Case]
  • April 24, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 21, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 21, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for TRO ]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction ]
  • April 15, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 15, 2025: [New Case Opened]
  • April 15, 2025: [Summons Submitted]
  • April 15, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 15, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 15, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.