U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-bk-10700-
  • Case Name: LANA STOUT CULJIS
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [oEmploy (Application to)]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Trustee Notice of Lodging Proposed Order]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Declaration]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Employ (Application to)]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Notice of Sale]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Hearing on Motion (Notice of)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Approve Sale (Motion to)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [zDischarge of Debtor and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Approve Sale (Motion to)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [BNC Form Request--Chapter 7 Discharge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.