U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cv-00176
  • Case Name: Seald Sweet LLC v. Empresas Heras SA de CV et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 02, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Filing - Amended Pleading (LRCiv 15.1(b))]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Lis Pendens ]
  • April 28, 2025: [Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Report and Recommendation]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 21, 2025: [25 Pct Mag - Election to Assign Case to District Judge]
  • April 17, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • April 16, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency re Disclosure Statement]
  • April 16, 2025: [New Case Opened]
  • April 16, 2025: [Summons Submitted]
  • April 16, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 16, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.