U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-08078
  • Case Name: Doria v. Select Quote Insurance Services Incorporated
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice to Self-Represented Litigant]
  • April 16, 2025: [New Case Opened]
  • April 16, 2025: [Allow Electronic Filing]
  • April 16, 2025: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 16, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.