U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00566-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gaither et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • May 01, 2025: [Arraignment (Text Only)]
  • May 01, 2025: [Detention Hearing (Text Only)]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 01, 2025: [Initial Appearance (Text Only)]
  • May 01, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial and Extend Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • April 28, 2025: [Continue Trial and Extend Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • April 23, 2025: [Arraignment (Text Only)]
  • April 23, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 16, 2025: [Indictment/Information/Complaint (Sealed - Unredacted)]
  • April 16, 2025: [DOJ Conflict Memo]
  • April 16, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.