U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-mj-00492/A-JR-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hollins
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Stipulation ]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 01, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 01, 2025: [Stipulation]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Time Change Only - Hearing]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • April 18, 2025: [Hearing]
  • April 18, 2025: [Brady v. Maryland - Tucson]
  • April 18, 2025: [Preliminary Hearing (Text Only)]
  • April 18, 2025: [~Util - Interpreter Language (Calendars)]
  • April 18, 2025: [Initial Appearance (Text Only) - Tucson]
  • April 18, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Material Witness]
  • April 17, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
  • April 17, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA 23]
  • April 17, 2025: [Affidavit for Detention of Material Witness]
  • April 17, 2025: [Arrest]
  • April 17, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.