U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-01269
  • Case Name: Andrews v. Arizona, State of
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • May 01, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 29, 2025: [Mail Returned]
  • April 28, 2025: [Compel]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Allow Electronic Filing]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 25, 2025: [Allow Electronic Filing]
  • April 25, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 24, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice to Self-Represented Litigant]
  • April 17, 2025: [New Case Opened]
  • April 17, 2025: [Service Executed]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.