U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:23-bk-02191-
  • Case Name: Sherry Louise Ost and Jeffrey Douglas Ost
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Notice to be Mailed to Interested Parties by BNC]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [oWithdraw as Attorney]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Deficiency Memo (QC Form)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Withdraw as Attorney (Motion to)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.