U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-03406
  • Case Name: SERGIO ALEJANDRO HURTADO-RODRIGUEZ and CYNTHIA CONCEPCION RODRIGUEZ
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [zNotice of Dismissal Order and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [oReinstating Case - VAN Form]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Reinstate Case (Motion to)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [oDismissing Case - VAN Form]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Disclosure of Compensation]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Individual Debtor's Statement of Intention]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Schedules]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Notice to Creditors re: Chapter 7 Current Monthly Income Not Filed]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Request for Notice]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (338.00 fee)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (338.00 fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.