U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-03389-
  • Case Name: DAVID BRUCE COBLE
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (338.00 fee)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.