U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:25-bk-03388-
  • Case Name: ROBERT ARMBRUSTER
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [Receipt for Petition Filing Fee (New Case)]
April, 2025
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Application to)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [Disclosure of Compensation of Bankruptcy Preparer]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [AA Schedules and Statements (Formerly All Required)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [Initial Mailing List]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Debtors Without an Attorney]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [1Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [oPay Filing Fee (80.00 Not Paid) (Chapter 7 or 11) - VAN Form]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [1Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.