U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-03425-
  • Case Name: ANDREW R DURANT
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Receipt for Petition Filing Fee Installment]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Updated Address Notice (Undeliverable Mail)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [oDenying Application of the Debtor for Waiver of the Chapter 7 FF(Form) (338 fee)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [oDenying Application to Waive Filing Fee and to Pay Fee in Installments (Judge Order)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Debtor Application to Waive Payment of Chapter 7 Filing Fee]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Disclosure of Compensation of Bankruptcy Preparer]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [AA Schedules and Statements (Formerly All Required)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Initial Mailing List]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Debtors Without an Attorney]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [1Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [1Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.