U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-03424-
  • Case Name: JADEN ISAIAH TREVON CARNES
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [oWaiving Payment of Chapter 7 Filing Fee (Judge Order)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Debtors Without an Attorney]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Debtor Application to Waive Payment of Chapter 7 Filing Fee]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [AA Schedules and Statements (Formerly All Required)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation 122A-2]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Initial Mailing List]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [1Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [ID Requested, Identity Confirmed Filed by Non Debtor]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [1Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.