U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-mj-04140-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sanchez-Siquieros et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 29, 2025: [Detention Hearing (Text Only)]
  • April 29, 2025: [Initial Appearance (Text Only)]
  • April 29, 2025: [Preliminary Hearing (Text Only)]
  • April 29, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Interpreter Language (Calendars)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Interpreter Language (Calendars)]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 23, 2025: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 23, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Interpreter Language (Calendars)]
  • April 22, 2025: [Brady Order - Phoenix]
  • April 22, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Interpreter Language (Calendars)]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Interpreter Language (Calendars)]
  • April 21, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 21, 2025: [Brady Order - Phoenix]
  • April 18, 2025: [Complaint]
  • April 18, 2025: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.