U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-03440-
  • Case Name: ARTURO BEDOLLA
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [zNotice of Dismissal Order and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [oReinstating Case - VAN Form]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 13]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Reinstate Case (Motion to)]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [DeBN Debtor Electronic Noticing Request]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Receipt for Petition Filing Fee Installment]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [oDismissing Case - VAN Form]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Deficiency Memo (QC Form)]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Debtors Without an Attorney]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Chapter 13 Plan and Notice of Date to File Objection]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [AA Schedules and Statements (Formerly All Required)]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Application for Access to Electronic Drop Box and Declaration Regarding Electronic Filing]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 13]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Initial Mailing List]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Application to)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [1Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [oPay Filing Fee (80.00 Not Paid) (Chapter 12 or 13) - VAN Form]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [4Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Meeting of Creditors 13]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.