U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-bk-03438-
  • Case Name: Talking Rock Land, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appearance (Notice of)]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [oAccelerate/Expedite]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appearance (Notice of)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Filing]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Accelerate/Expedite (Motion to)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [List of Twenty Largest Unsecured Creditors]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Schedules]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Approve Use of Cash Collateral (Motion to)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appearance (Notice of)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Bar Date (negative notice) (Notice of)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Relief from Stay (Motion for) (199.00 fee)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Bar Date (negative notice) (Notice of)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Approve (Motion to)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [oEmploy (Application to)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Deficiency Memo (QC Form)]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appearance (Notice of)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Verified Statement of Professional FRBP 2014]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Employ (Application to)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [List of Twenty Largest Unsecured Creditors]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 11 Corp/Part]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Declaration]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appearance (Notice of)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Removal]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appearance (Notice of)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [Appearance (Notice of)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [oChapter 11 Status Conference (DPC Form)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [oEmploy (Application to)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [Verified Statement of Professional FRBP 2014]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [Employ (Application to)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [Meeting of Creditors 11 (Business)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [2Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) (1738.00 fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.