U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-mj-05225-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Flores
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Transcript]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Witness List]
  • April 30, 2025: [Exhibit List ]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss All Charges]
  • April 28, 2025: [Dismiss All Charges]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Transcript Request]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Detention Hearing (Text Only)]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Interpreter Language (Calendars)]
  • April 21, 2025: [Initial Appearance (Text Only)]
  • April 21, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
  • April 21, 2025: [Brady Order - Phoenix]
  • April 18, 2025: [Arrest]
  • April 18, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.