U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-00242-
  • Case Name: CHARLES BRIAN WILLIS
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Deficiency Memo - No Financial Management Course]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Notice of Reaffirmation Hearing (Form)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Reaffirmation Agreement and Motion to Approve - Pro Se Debtor]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [oExtend]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Extend (Motion to)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Deficiency Memo (QC Form)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Extend (Motion to)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.