U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-03451-PS
  • Case Name: DANIEL DOUGLAS GRIFFIN and AMANDA JUNE MACKENZIE
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Request for Notice]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (338.00 fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.