U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-03450
  • Case Name: FRANCISCO CHAIDEZ and REFUGIO RUTH CHAIDEZ
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Objection to Confirmation]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Financial Management Course Certificate]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Appearance (Notice of)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 13]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Chapter 13 Plan and Application for Pmt of Administrative Expense and Notc of Date to File Objection]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan and Application for Pmt of Administrative Expense and Notc of Date to File Objection]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [4Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (313.00 fee)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [4Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (313.00 fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.