U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-03447-
  • Case Name: MONIQUE KIMMONS
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Receipt for Petition Filing Fee Installment]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Application for Access to Electronic Drop Box and Declaration Regarding Electronic Filing]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Bankruptcy Preparer]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Initial Mailing List]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [AA Schedules and Statements (Formerly All Required)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Debtors Without an Attorney]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Application to)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [1Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [oPay Filing Fee (80.00 Not Paid) (Chapter 7 or 11) - VAN Form]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [1Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.