U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-mj-05229-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Diaz-Torres
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 28, 2025: [Detention Hearing (Text Only)]
  • April 28, 2025: [Preliminary Hearing (Text Only)]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • April 24, 2025: [Extension of Time to Indict ]
  • April 22, 2025: [Brady Order - Phoenix]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Interpreter Language (Calendars)]
  • April 22, 2025: [Initial Appearance (Text Only)]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
  • April 18, 2025: [Complaint]
  • April 18, 2025: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.