U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-bk-08224-
  • Case Name: MARJAN ASHABI
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [oPay Unclaimed Funds to Court]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Receipt for Unclaimed Funds or Dividends to the Court]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Application to Pay Unclaimed Funds or Dividends to the Court]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [oTrustee Application for Compensation (Chapter 7 or 11)]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Trustee Notice of Lodging Proposed Order (batch)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.