U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:23-bk-04450-
  • Case Name: CHRISTOPHER BRAVO and REBECCA BRAVO
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Filing Fee Paid--Reopen]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [zNotice of Claims Bar Date and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Appointment of Trustee]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [BNC Form Request--Notice of Claims Bar Date]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Request to Set Claims Bar Date (batch)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [oReopening Bankruptcy Case]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Trustee Notice of Lodging Proposed Order (batch)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Withdrawal of Report of No Distribution]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Deficiency Memo (QC Form)]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Trustee Notice of Lodging Proposed Order (batch)]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Motion to Reopen Case (Reopen Fee Due)]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Withdrawal of Report of No Distribution]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.