U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-03466-
  • Case Name: ASHLEY MARIE ATWOOD
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Individual Debtor's Statement of Intention]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Update EOUST Stats]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Summary of Schedules]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Schedules]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney FRBP 2016]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [1Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [2Set Missing Filings Deadlines]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (338.00 fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.