U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cv-00180
  • Case Name: McGettigan v. Watson
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • April 29, 2025: [Demand for Jury Trial by Defendant]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
  • April 29, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • April 24, 2025: [Service Executed]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 21, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)]
  • April 21, 2025: [New Case Opened]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.