U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-03535
  • Case Name: Monica Ann Cavanaugh
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Chapter 13 Plan and Notice of Date to File Objection]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Appearance (Notice of)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Request for Notice]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 13]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [2Set Missing Filings Deadlines]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Voluntary Petition - Case Upload (Chapter 13) (313.00 fee)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition - Case Upload (Chapter 13) (313.00 fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.