U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00596-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Izquierdo-Montero
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Judgment and Commitment Issued/Judgment of Probation Issued]
  • April 29, 2025: [Plea Agreement ]
  • April 29, 2025: [Plea and Sentence (Text Only)]
  • April 29, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Special Appearance]
  • April 25, 2025: [Special Appearance]
  • April 23, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [DOJ Conflict Memo]
  • April 22, 2025: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 22, 2025: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.