U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-03552-
  • Case Name: ALMA ROSA ROSS
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [oNonpayment of Required Filing Fee - VAN Form]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Amendment to Schedules (D,E/F/34.00 Fee)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Individual Debtor's Statement of Intention]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Schedules]
April, 2025
  • April 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [AA Schedules and Statements (Formerly All Required)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Debtors Without an Attorney]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Initial Mailing List]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [1Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [oPay Filing Fee (80.00 Not Paid) (Chapter 7 or 11) - VAN Form]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [ID Requested, Identity Confirmed Filed by Non Debtor]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [1Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.