U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-03550-
  • Case Name: WILLIAM ROBERT LINNEY and LAUREN KENDAL YOUNG
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [UST Statement Non-Formation of Committee (batch)]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [zNotice of Dismissal Order and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [oDismissing Case - VAN Form]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Statement of Monthly Income Form 122B]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Application for Access to Electronic Drop Box and Declaration Regarding Electronic Filing]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Court Corrective Advisory]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 11 Indiv/Joint]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Initial Mailing List]
  • April 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [Receipt for Petition Filing Fee (New Case)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [List of Twenty Largest Unsecured Creditors]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [1Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [Appearance (Notice of)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [oPay Filing Fee (80.00 Not Paid) (Chapter 7 or 11) - VAN Form]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [ID Requested, Identity Confirmed Filed by Non Debtor]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [Meeting of Creditors 11]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [2Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.