U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-03549-PS
  • Case Name: HOWARD G. BENNETT
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Receipt for Petition Filing Fee Installment]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
April, 2025
  • April 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [oPay Filing Fee (80.00 Not Paid) (Chapter 7 or 11) - VAN Form]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation 122A-2]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Application to)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (338.00 fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.