U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-03548-
  • Case Name: MIGUEL ANGEL VALENZUELA
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Appearance (Notice of)]
  • May 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [zNotice of Dismissal Order and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [oDismissing Case - VAN Form]
April, 2025
  • April 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Receipt for Petition Filing Fee (New Case)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 13]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Initial Mailing List]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Debtors Without an Attorney]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [1Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [4Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Meeting of Creditors 13]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.