U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-03559-
  • Case Name: BREE BAILEY EDIC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Final Report - Dismissed Case (Chapter 13) (batch)]
  • May 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Receipt for Petition Filing Fee Installment]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [oReinstating Case - VAN Form]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [oDismissing Case - VAN Form]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [AA Schedules and Statements (Formerly All Required)]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Amendment to Mailing List (34.00 fee)]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Continue the Section 362(a) Stay pursuant to Section 362(c)(3) (Motion to)]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Chapter 13 Plan and Application for Pmt of Administrative Expense and Notc of Date to File Objection]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 13]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Initial Mailing List]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Request for Notice]
  • April 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [2Set Missing Filings Deadlines]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Debtors Without an Attorney]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Application to)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [1Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [oPay Filing Fee (80.00 Not Paid) (Chapter 12 or 13) - VAN Form]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [4Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.