U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-ap-00138-
  • Case Name: SCHERRER v. Scherrer
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Affidavit of Service]
April, 2025
  • April 26, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 25, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Issued (Form) ]
  • April 24, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [oPotential Dismissal of Adversary - VAN Form]
  • April 23, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Request for Issuance of Summons]
  • April 23, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.