U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-ap-00137-
  • Case Name: Inscription Canyon Ranch, L.P. v. Talking Rock Land, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Response]
  • May 13, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • May 13, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Exceed Page Limit (Motion to)]
  • May 13, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Objection]
  • May 13, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [oExceed Page Limit]
  • May 09, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Service of Discovery Requests (Notice of)]
  • May 09, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • May 09, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Exceed Page Limit (Motion to)]
  • May 08, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Service of Discovery Requests (Notice of)]
  • May 07, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Filing]
  • May 06, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Appearance in Adversary Proceeding (Notice of)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing (Notice of)]
  • April 30, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Appearance in Adversary Proceeding (Notice of)]
  • April 30, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Service of Discovery Requests (Notice of)]
  • April 29, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Remand (Motion to)]
  • April 29, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [oExceed Page Limit]
  • April 28, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 28, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Exceed Page Limit (Motion to)]
  • April 28, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Appearance in Adversary Proceeding (Notice of)]
  • April 25, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Appearance in Adversary Proceeding (Notice of)]
  • April 23, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • April 23, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.