U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-03572-
  • Case Name: ROBERT L JOHNSON
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Receipt for Petition Filing Fee Installment]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [2Set Missing Filings Deadlines]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [oExtend Time to File Schedules, Stmts, Declarations, Plan or MML (Form)]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Extend Time to File Chapter 13 Plan (Motion to)]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Extend Time to File Schedules and Statements (Motion to)]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Request for Notice]
April, 2025
  • April 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 13]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Application to)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Initial Mailing List]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [1Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [oPay Filing Fee (80.00 Not Paid) (Chapter 12 or 13) - VAN Form]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [4Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Meeting of Creditors 13]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.