U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-03570
  • Case Name: JAMES RAMON GILMORE
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Disclosure of Compensation]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [AA Schedules and Statements (Formerly All Required)]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation 122A-2]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Notice to Creditors re: Chapter 7 Current Monthly Income Not Filed]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • April 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (338.00 fee)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (338.00 fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.