U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:25-bk-03597
  • Case Name: SHANNA LORRAINE SCORDEL
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Request for Notice]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney FRBP 2016]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Individual Debtor's Statement of Intention]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Schedules]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Amendment to Mailing List (34.00 fee)]
April, 2025
  • April 26, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 26, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (338.00 fee)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (338.00 fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.