U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-03594
  • Case Name: MANUEL BENJAMIN RUIZESPARZA and MALAURA KATHLEEN RUIZESPARZA
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney FRBP 2016]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Individual Debtor's Statement of Intention]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Schedules]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Financial Management Course Certificate]
April, 2025
  • April 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (338.00 fee)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (338.00 fee)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.