U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-03593
  • Case Name: CYNTHIA CAROL THOMPSON
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney FRBP 2016]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation 122A-2]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Individual Debtor's Statement of Intention]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Schedules]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Request for Notice]
  • April 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (338.00 fee)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (338.00 fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.