U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-03616
  • Case Name: TOGETHERMENT MANAGEMENT, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [audio]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [oEmploy (Application to)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [oEmploy (Application to)]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Employ (Application to)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [oOrder to Show Cause (Mailed to Interested Parties Only)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Accelerate/Expedite (Motion to)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Order to Show Cause (Application for)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Appearance (Notice of)]
  • April 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Receipt for Petition Filing Fee (New Case)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Corp/Part]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Initial Mailing List]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [1Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [1Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.