U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:25-bk-03613-PS
  • Case Name: TIFFANY ANNE WEST
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Receipt for Petition Filing Fee Installment]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
April, 2025
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 26, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 26, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Initial Mailing List]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Individual Debtor's Statement of Intention]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [AA Schedules and Statements (Formerly All Required)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Application to)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Debtors Without an Attorney]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [1Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [oPay Filing Fee (80.00 Not Paid) (Chapter 7 or 11) - VAN Form]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [1Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.