U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-mj-01523-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Felix-Ramirez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution - USA]
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 12, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 12, 2025: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • May 05, 2025: [Extension of Time to Indict ]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 25, 2025: [Brady Order - Phoenix]
  • April 25, 2025: [Detention Hearing (Text Only)]
  • April 25, 2025: [Preliminary Hearing (Text Only)]
  • April 25, 2025: [Initial Appearance (Text Only)]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Interpreter Language (Calendars)]
  • April 25, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Complaint]
  • April 24, 2025: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.