U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-mj-07432/A-EJM-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sepulveda
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • May 14, 2025: [Detention Hearing (Text Only)]
  • May 12, 2025: [Status Conference (Text Only)]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Brady v. Maryland - Tucson]
  • April 29, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA 23]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 29, 2025: [Initial Appearance (Text Only)]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Interpreter Language (Calendars)]
  • April 29, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
  • April 29, 2025: [Preliminary Hearing (Text Only)]
  • April 28, 2025: [Arrest]
  • April 28, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.