U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00600-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sanchez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice re Passport]
  • April 30, 2025: [Surrender/Return of Passport]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Related Case]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 25, 2025: [Brady Order - Phoenix]
  • April 25, 2025: [Detention Hearing (Text Only)]
  • April 25, 2025: [Arraignment (Text Only)]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 25, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
  • April 25, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 25, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 25, 2025: [Arrest]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • April 25, 2025: [Expedite ]
  • April 24, 2025: [Indictment/Information/Complaint (Sealed - Unredacted)]
  • April 23, 2025: [DOJ Conflict Memo]
  • April 23, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.