U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00611-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Ginanni et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice re Passport]
  • April 30, 2025: [Surrender/Return of Passport]
  • April 28, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • April 25, 2025: [Expedite ]
  • April 24, 2025: [Indictment/Information/Complaint (Sealed - Unredacted)]
  • April 23, 2025: [DOJ Conflict Memo]
  • April 23, 2025: [Indictment]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.