U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-00260-
  • Case Name: STEPHEN JACOB ISAIAH HODGES
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [zDischarge of Debtor and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [oExtend]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [BNC Form Request--Chapter 7 Discharge]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Deficiency Memo - No Financial Management Course]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Extend (Motion to)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.