U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-03630-
  • Case Name: MARIA ALEJANDRA GARCIA
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [2Set Missing Filings Deadlines]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [oOther Order to be Mailed to Interested Parties by BNC]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Certificate that Debtor was Unable to Obtain Credit Counseling Due to Exigent Circumstances]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [oPay Filing Fee (80.00 Not Paid) (Chapter 7 or 11) - VAN Form]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Application to)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [1Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Request for Notice]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [1Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.