U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-03661-PS
  • Case Name: BERNELL E. BOLDING, JR.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Notice of Hearing - VAN Form]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [oPay Filing Fee (80.00 Not Paid) (Chapter 7 or 11) - VAN Form]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation 122A-2]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Application to)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (338.00 fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.