U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-mc-00015
  • Case Name: Champion Power Equipment Incorporated v. Generac Power Systems Incorporated
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Response to Motion to Consolidate/Transfer Cases]
  • May 12, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 07, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • May 07, 2025: [Response to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • April 30, 2025: [Transfer Related Case]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order of Recusal]
  • April 29, 2025: [New Case Opened]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency re Disclosure Statement]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 29, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 29, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.